The Council elected Denmark for a term beginning on 1 January 2007 and expiring on 31 December 2009, to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of Sweden. | UN | انتخب المجلس الدانمرك لفترة تبدأ في 1 كانون الثاني/يناير 2007 وتنتهي في 31 كانون الأول/ديسمبر 2009، لملء شاغر نشأ عن استقالة السويد. |
The Council elected Denmark for a term beginning on 1 January 2007 and expiring on 31 December 2009, to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of Sweden. | UN | انتخب المجلس الدانمرك لفترة ولاية تبدأ في 1 كانون الثاني/يناير 2007 وتنتهي في 31 كانون الأول/ديسمبر 2009، لملء شاغر نشأ عن استقالة السويد. |
The Secretary-General will appoint a new member to the Committee to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of Mr. Zhiyong Zhang (China), whose term of office expires on 30 June 2009. | UN | سيقوم الأمين العام بتعيين عضو جديد باللجنة لملئ شاغر ناتج عن استقالة السيد زيونغ زانغ (الصين) الذي تنتهي فترة ولايته في 30 حزيران/يونيه 2009. |
The Council also postponed the election of one member from Eastern European States for a term beginning on the date of election and expiring on 31 December 2006 to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of the Czech Republic from the Executive Board. | UN | وأرجأ المجلس أيضا انتخاب عضو واحد من دول أوروبا الشرقية لفترة تبدأ من تاريخ الانتخاب وتنتهي في 31 كانون الأول/ديسمبر 2006، لملء شاغر نشأ نتيجة استقالة الجمهورية التشيكية من المجلس التنفيذي. |
aa At its 10th meeting, on 26 April 2012, the Council elected Ireland, Netherlands, New Zealand, Portugal and the United Kingdom for terms beginning on 1 January 2013, to fill vacancies arising from the resignation of Luxembourg, Canada, Denmark, Israel and Greece, respectively (see decision 2012/201 A). | UN | (أ أ) انتخب المجلس، في جلسته العاشرة، المعقودة في 26 نيسان/أبريل 2011، أيرلندا، والبرتغال، والمملكة المتحدة، ونيوزيلندا، وهولندا لفترة عضوية تبدأ في 1 كانون الثاني/يناير 2013 لملء الشواغر الناتجة عن استقالة لكسمبرغ، وكندا، والدانمرك، وإسرائيل، واليونان، على التوالي (انظر المقرر 2012/201 ألف). |
vv At its 10th meeting, on 27 April 2011, the Council elected Germany and Portugal for terms beginning on 1 January 2012 to fill vacancies arising from the resignation of Monaco and the Netherlands, respectively (see decision 2011/201 B). | UN | (ت ت) انتخب المجلس، في جلسته العاشرة، المعقودة في 27 نيسان/أبريل 2011 ألمانيا والبرتغال لفترتي عضوية تبدءان في 1 كانون الثاني/يناير 2012 لملء شاغرين نتجا عن استقالة موناكو وهولنـــــدا، علـــــى التوالي (انظر المقرر 2011/201 باء). |
aa Appointed by the Council at its 2nd meeting, on 10 February 2009, to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of Tariq Banuri (Pakistan) (see decision 2009/201 A). | UN | (أ أ) عينه المجلس في جلسته 2 المعقودة في 10 شباط/فبراير 2009، لملء شاغر نظرا لاستقالة طارق بنوري (باكستان) (انظر المقرر 2009/201 ألف). |
z Appointed by the Secretary-General to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of Pascal Saint-Amans (France) (decision 2008/201 B). | UN | (ض) عينه الأمين العام لملء شاغر نشأ عن استقالة باسكال سان - أمان (فرنسا) (المقرر 2008/201 باء). |
aa Appointed by the Secretary-General to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of Patricia A. Brown (United States of America) (decision 2008/201 B). | UN | (أأ) عينها الأمين العام لملء شاغر نشأ عن استقالة باتريشيا أ. براون (الولايات المتحدة الأمريكية) (المقرر 2008/201 باء). |
bb Appointed by the Secretary-General to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of Nobuyuki Nakamura (Japan) (decision 2008/201 B). Related bodies | UN | (ب ب) عينه الأمين العام لملء شاغر نشأ عن استقالة نوبويوكي ناكامورا (اليابان) (المقرر 2008/201 باء). |
z Appointed by the Secretary-General to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of Pascal Saint-Amans (France) (decision 2008/201 B). | UN | (ض) عينه الأمين العام لملء شاغر نشأ عن استقالة باسكال سان - أمان (فرنسا) (المقرر 2008/201 باء). |
The Council took note of the appointment by the Secretary-General of Tizhong Liao (China) for a term beginning on the date of appointment and expiring on 30 June 2009 to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of Zhiyong Zhang (China). | UN | أحاط المجلس علما بتعيين الأمين العام للسيد تيزونغ لياو (الصين) لفترة تبدأ من تاريخ التعيين وتنتهي في 30 حزيران/يونيه 2009 لملء شاغر ناتج عن استقالة السيد زيونغ زانغ (الصين). |
The Council elected Arundhati Ghose (India) for a term beginning on the date of election and expiring on 31 December 2006, to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of Chokila Iyer (India). | UN | انتخب المجلس أرونداتي غوسي (الهند) لفترة تبدأ في تاريخ الانتخاب وتنتهي في 31 كانون الأول/ديسمبر 2006، لملء شاغر ناتج عن استقالة تشوكالي أيير (الهند). |
The Council took note of the appointment by the Secretary-General of Tizhong Liao (China) for a term beginning on the date of appointment and expiring on 30 June 2009 to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of Zhiyong Zhang (China). | UN | أحاط المجلس علما بتعيين الأمين العام للسيد تيزونغ لياو (الصين) لفترة تبدأ من تاريخ التعيين وتنتهي في 30 حزيران/يونيه 2009 لملء شاغر نشأ نتيجة استقالة السيد زيونغ زانغ (الصين). |
The Council elected Barbara Wilson (Switzerland) by acclamation for a term beginning 1 January 2007 and expiring on 31 December 2008, to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of Giorgio Malinverni (Switzerland). | UN | انتخب المجلس باربارا ويلسن (سويسرا) بالتزكية لفترة تبدأ في 1 كانون الثاني/يناير 2007 وتنتهي في 31 كانون الأول/ديسمبر 2008 لملء شاغر نشأ نتيجة استقالة جيورجيو مالينفيرني (سويسرا). |
Canadakk Finlandkk Portugalkk kk At its 10th meeting, on 27 April 2011, the Council elected Austria, Canada, Finland and Portugal for terms beginning on 1 January 2012 to fill vacancies arising from the resignation of New Zealand, France, Italy and Denmark, respectively (see decision 2011/201 B). | UN | (ك ك) انتخب المجلس، في جلسته العاشرة، المعقودة في 27 نيسان/أبريل 2011 البرتغال وفنلندا وكندا والنمسا لفترة عضوية تبدأ في 1 كانون الثاني/يناير 2012 لملء الشواغر الناتجة عن استقالة نيوزيلندا وفرنسا وإيطاليا والدانمرك، على التوالي (انظر المقرر 2011/201 باء). |
At the 10th meeting, the Council elected Spain and Pakistan for terms beginning on 1 January 2013 and expiring on 31 December 2013, to fill vacancies arising from the resignation of Norway and the Republic of Korea, respectively (see decision 2012/201 A). | UN | وفي الجلسة 10، انتخب المجلس إسبانيا وباكستان لمدة عضوية تبدأ في 1 كانون الثاني/يناير 2013 وتنتهي في 31 كانون الأول/ديسمبر 2013، لملء شاغرين نتجا عن استقالة النرويج وجمهورية كوريا، على التوالي (انظر المقرر 2012/201 ألف). |
bb Appointed by the Council at its 46th meeting, on 12 September 2008, to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of Anatoly Vishnevsky (Russian Federation) (see decision 2008/201 F). | UN | (ب ب) عينه المجلس في جلسته 46 المعقودة في 12 أيلول/سبتمبر 2008، لملء شاغر نظرا لاستقالة أناتولي فيشنفسكي (الاتحاد الروسي) (انظر المقرر 2009/201 ألف). |
The Council proceeded to elect one member to the Board by secret ballot to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of Ms. Rosa María del Castillo (Peru). | UN | شرع المجلس في انتخاب عضو واحد بالهيئة بالاقتراع السري لملء شاغر ناجم عن استقالة السيدة روسا ماريا ديل كاستيو (بيرو). |
Canaday Finlandy Switzerlandy y At its 10th meeting, on 25 April 2013, the Council elected Belgium, Canada, Finland and Switzerland for terms beginning on 1 January 2014, to fill vacancies arising from the resignation of Portugal, New Zealand, Spain and Japan, respectively (see decision 2013/201 B). | UN | (شذ) انتخب المجلس في جلسته العاشرة، المعقودة في 25 نيسان/أبريل 2013، بلجيكا وكندا وفنلندا وسويسرا لفترات عضوية تبدأ في 1 كانون الثاني/يناير 2014 لملء الشواغر الناتجة عن تخلي البرتغال ونيوزيلندا وإسبانيا واليابان عن مقاعدها، على التوالي (انظر المقرر 2013/201 باء). |
2. The Government of India has nominated Vinay Kumar to fill the vacancy arising from the resignation of Ms. Khampa. | UN | 2 - وقد رشحت حكومة الهند السيد فيناي كومار لشغل المنصب الذي شغر نتيجة لاستقالة السيدة كامبا. |
cc At its 10th meeting, on 26 April 2012, the Council elected Australia, Austria and Belgium for terms beginning on 1 January 2013 and expiring on 31 December 2013, to fill vacancies arising from the resignation of the United States of America, Netherlands and Finland, respectively (see decision 2012/201 A). | UN | (ج ج) انتخب المجلس في جلسته العاشرة، المعقودة في 26 نيسان/ أبريل 2012، أستراليا والنمسا وبلجيكا لمدد عضوية تبدأ من 1 كانون الثاني/يناير 2013، لملء شواغر ناتجة عن استقالة الولايات المتحدة الأمريكية وهولندا وفنلندا، على التوالي (انظر المقرر 2012/201 ألف). |
The Council elected Eugenio A. Insigne (Philippines) to the Permanent Forum on Indigenous Issues for a term beginning on 1 January 2009 and expiring on 31 December 2010, to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of Xiaomei Qin (China). | UN | انتخب المجلس يوخينيو أ. إنسغنيه (الفلبين) في المنتدى الدائم المعني بقضايا الشعوب الأصلية لفترة تبدأ في 1 كانون الثاني/يناير 2009 وتنتهي في 31 كانون الأول/ ديسمبر 2010 لملء مقعد أصبح شاغرا بسبب استقالة كسياومي كين (الصين). |
2. The Government of Germany has nominated Jörg Stosberg to fill the vacancy arising from the resignation of Mr. Kuntzle. | UN | 2 - وقد رشحت حكومة ألمانيا يورغ ستوسبرغ لملء الشاغر الناجم عن استقالة السيد كونتزله. |
The Council elected Eugenio A. Insigne (Philippines) for a term beginning on 1 January 2009 and expiring on 31 December 2010, to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of Qin Xiaomei (China). | UN | انتخب المجلس يوهينيو أ. إنسينيه (الفلبين) لفترة تبدأ في 1 كانون الثاني/يناير 2009 وتنتهي في 31 كانون الأول/ديسمبر 2010 لملء الشاغر الناشئ باستقالة تشين شياومي (الصين). |
Australiar Canadar Spainr r At its 12th meeting, on 23 April 2014, the Council elected Australia, Canada and Spain for terms beginning on 1 January 2015, to fill vacancies arising from the resignation of New Zealand, Denmark and the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland, respectively (see decision 2014/201 A). | UN | (ص) في الجلسة 12، المعقودة في 23 نيسان/أبريل 2014، انتخب المجلس أستراليا وإسبانيا وكندا لفترة عضوية تبدأ في 1 كانون الثاني/يناير 2015، لملء شواغر ناجمة عن استقالة نيوزيلندا والمملكة المتحدة لبريطانيا العظمى وأيرلندا الشمالية والدانمارك، على التوالي (انظر المقرر 2014/201 ألف). |
The Council appointed Wang Xiaochu (China) for a term beginning on the date of appointment and expiring on 31 December 2005, to fill a vacancy arising from the resignation of Jin Liqun (China). | UN | عين المجلس وانغ جياوشو (الصين) لمدة عضوية تبدأ من تاريخ التعيين وتنتهي في 31 كانون الأول/ديسمبر 2005، لملء شاغر نجم عن استقالة جين ليكون (الصين). |